Limit your search

1-8 of 8
  1. S.Amdt.3241 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] (Submitted 12/15/2009)
  2. S.Amdt.3204 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] (Submitted 12/14/2009)
  3. S.Amdt.3103 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] (Submitted 12/09/2009)
  4. S.Amdt.2943 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] (Submitted 12/06/2009)
  5. S.Amdt.2892 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] (Submitted 12/04/2009)
  6. S.Amdt.2891 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] (Submitted 12/04/2009)
  7. S.Amdt.2890 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] (Submitted 12/04/2009)
  8. S.Amdt.2889 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] (Submitted 12/04/2009)