Limit your search

1-20 of 20
  1. S.Amdt.3246 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] (Submitted 12/16/2009)
    Cosponsors: 0
  2. S.Amdt.3235 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] (Submitted 12/15/2009)
    Cosponsors: 1
  3. S.Amdt.3234 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] (Submitted 12/15/2009)
    Cosponsors: 0
  4. S.Amdt.3184 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] (Submitted 12/11/2009)
    Cosponsors: 0
  5. S.Amdt.3168 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] (Submitted 12/11/2009)
    Cosponsors: 1
  6. S.Amdt.3164 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] (Submitted 12/11/2009)
    Cosponsors: 0
  7. S.Amdt.3115 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] (Submitted 12/10/2009)
    Cosponsors: 1
  8. S.Amdt.3099 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] (Submitted 12/09/2009)
    Cosponsors: 0
  9. S.Amdt.3098 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] (Submitted 12/09/2009)
    Cosponsors: 1
  10. S.Amdt.3064 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] (Submitted 12/08/2009)
    Cosponsors: 0
  11. S.Amdt.3033 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] (Submitted 12/08/2009)
    Cosponsors: 1
  12. S.Amdt.2972 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] (Submitted 12/07/2009)
    Cosponsors: 0
  13. S.Amdt.2971 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] (Submitted 12/07/2009)
    Cosponsors: 0
  14. S.Amdt.2970 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] (Submitted 12/07/2009)
    Cosponsors: 0
  15. S.Amdt.2946 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] (Submitted 12/06/2009)
    Cosponsors: 0
  16. S.Amdt.2929 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] (Submitted 12/05/2009)
    Cosponsors: 2
  17. S.Amdt.2928 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] (Submitted 12/05/2009)
    Cosponsors: 2
  18. S.Amdt.2924 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] (Submitted 12/05/2009)
    Cosponsors: 4
  19. S.Amdt.2893 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] (Submitted 12/04/2009)
    Cosponsors: 1
  20. S.Amdt.2790 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] (Submitted 11/30/2009)
    Cosponsors: 11