Limit your search

1-16 of 16
  1. S.Amdt.3283 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] (Submitted 12/19/2009)
    Cosponsors: 0
  2. S.Amdt.3206 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] (Submitted 12/14/2009)
    Cosponsors: 0
  3. S.Amdt.3205 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] (Submitted 12/14/2009)
    Cosponsors: 0
  4. S.Amdt.3000 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] (Submitted 12/07/2009)
    Cosponsors: 0
  5. S.Amdt.2969 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] (Submitted 12/07/2009)
    Cosponsors: 6
  6. S.Amdt.2968 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] (Submitted 12/07/2009)
    Cosponsors: 0
  7. S.Amdt.2967 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] (Submitted 12/07/2009)
    Cosponsors: 0
  8. S.Amdt.2966 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] (Submitted 12/07/2009)
    Cosponsors: 0
  9. S.Amdt.2965 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] (Submitted 12/07/2009)
    Cosponsors: 0
  10. S.Amdt.2964 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] (Submitted 12/07/2009)
    Cosponsors: 0
  11. S.Amdt.2963 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] (Submitted 12/07/2009)
    Cosponsors: 0
  12. S.Amdt.2825   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] (Submitted 12/02/2009)
    Cosponsors: 0
  13. S.Amdt.2824 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] (Submitted 12/02/2009)
    Cosponsors: 0
  14. S.Amdt.2823 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] (Submitted 12/02/2009)
    Cosponsors: 0
  15. S.Amdt.2789 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] (Submitted 11/21/2009)
    Cosponsors: 11
  16. S.Amdt.2788 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] (Submitted 11/21/2009)
    Cosponsors: 0