Limit your search

1-6 of 6
  1. S.Amdt.3236 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] (Submitted 12/15/2009)
    Cosponsors: 0
  2. S.Amdt.3131 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] (Submitted 12/10/2009)
    Cosponsors: 1
  3. S.Amdt.3128 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] (Submitted 12/10/2009)
    Cosponsors: 0
  4. S.Amdt.3069   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] (Submitted 12/08/2009)
    Cosponsors: 2
  5. S.Amdt.2996 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] (Submitted 12/07/2009)
    Cosponsors: 2
  6. S.Amdt.2862   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] (Submitted 12/03/2009)
    Cosponsors: 7