Limit your search

1-6 of 6
  1. S.Amdt.3273 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] (Submitted 12/18/2009)
    Cosponsors: 2
  2. S.Amdt.3258 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] (Submitted 12/16/2009)
    Cosponsors: 0
  3. S.Amdt.3157 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] (Submitted 12/10/2009)
    Cosponsors: 1
  4. S.Amdt.2961 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] (Submitted 12/07/2009)
    Cosponsors: 2
  5. S.Amdt.2960 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] (Submitted 12/07/2009)
    Cosponsors: 0
  6. S.Amdt.2915 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] (Submitted 12/04/2009)
    Cosponsors: 3