Limit your search

1-14 of 14
  1. S.Amdt.3275 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] (Submitted 12/18/2009)
  2. S.Amdt.3214 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] (Submitted 12/14/2009)
  3. S.Amdt.3213 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] (Submitted 12/14/2009)
  4. S.Amdt.3212 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] (Submitted 12/14/2009)
  5. S.Amdt.3211 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] (Submitted 12/14/2009)
  6. S.Amdt.3174 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] (Submitted 12/11/2009)
  7. S.Amdt.2999 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] (Submitted 12/07/2009)
  8. S.Amdt.2981 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] (Submitted 12/07/2009)
  9. S.Amdt.2975 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] (Submitted 12/07/2009)
  10. S.Amdt.2974 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] (Submitted 12/07/2009)
  11. S.Amdt.2948 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] (Submitted 12/06/2009)
  12. S.Amdt.2904 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] (Submitted 12/04/2009)
  13. S.Amdt.2903 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] (Submitted 12/04/2009)
  14. S.Amdt.2859 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] (Submitted 12/02/2009)