Limit your search

1-9 of 9
  1. S.Amdt.3262 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] (Submitted 12/17/2009)
    Cosponsors: 0
  2. S.Amdt.3226 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] (Submitted 12/15/2009)
    Cosponsors: 0
  3. S.Amdt.3100 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] (Submitted 12/09/2009)
    Cosponsors: 0
  4. S.Amdt.3031 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] (Submitted 12/08/2009)
    Cosponsors: 1
  5. S.Amdt.2914 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] (Submitted 12/04/2009)
    Cosponsors: 0
  6. S.Amdt.2913 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] (Submitted 12/04/2009)
    Cosponsors: 2
  7. S.Amdt.2912 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] (Submitted 12/04/2009)
    Cosponsors: 1
  8. S.Amdt.2870 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: To promote fiscal responsibility by protecting the Social Security surplus and CLASS program savings in this Act.
    Sponsor: Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] (Submitted 12/03/2009) (Proposed 12/03/2009)
    Cosponsors: 0
    Latest Action: 12/04/09 Amendment SA 2870 under the order of 12/4/2009, having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative, the amendment was agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 98 - 0. Record Vote Number: 359.
  9. S.Amdt.2828   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] (Submitted 12/02/2009)
    Cosponsors: 3