Limit your search

1-18 of 18
  1. S.Amdt.3278   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: To change the enactment date.
    Sponsor: Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] (Submitted 12/19/2009) (Proposed 12/19/2009)
    Cosponsors: 0
    Latest Action: 12/22/09 Motion to table amendment SA 3278 agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 60 - 39. Record Vote Number: 386.
  2. S.Amdt.3276 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: To improve the bill.
    Sponsor: Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] (Submitted 12/19/2009) (Proposed 12/19/2009)
    Cosponsors: 3
    Latest Action: 12/22/09 Amendment SA 3276 agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 60 - 39. Record Vote Number: 387.
  3. S.Amdt.3183 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: To protect middle class families from tax increases.
    Sponsor: Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] (Submitted 12/11/2009) (Proposed 12/15/2009)
    Cosponsors: 0
    Latest Action: 12/15/09 Amendment SA 3183 under the order of 12/14/2009, having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative, the amendment was agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 97 - 1. Record Vote Number: 375.
  4. S.Amdt.3156 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: To provide for the importation of prescription drugs.
    Sponsor: Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] (Submitted 12/10/2009) (Proposed 12/15/2009)
    Cosponsors: 3
    Latest Action: 12/16/09 Proposed amendment SA 3156 under the order of 12/15/2009, not having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative, the amendment was withdrawn in Senate. (consideration: CR S13239)
  5. S.Amdt.2962 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: To prohibit the use of Federal funds for abortions.
    Sponsor: Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] (Submitted 12/07/2009) (Proposed 12/07/2009)
    Cosponsors: 16
    Latest Action: 12/08/09 Motion to table amendment SA 2962 agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 54 - 45. Record Vote Number: 369. (consideration: CR S12683)
  6. S.Amdt.2942 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: To prevent Medicare from being raided for new entitlements and to use Medicare savings to save Medicare.
    Sponsor: Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] (Submitted 12/06/2009) (Proposed 12/06/2009)
    Cosponsors: 13
    Latest Action: 12/07/09 Proposed amendment SA 2942, under the order of 12/7/2009, not having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative, the amendment was withdrawn in Senate. (consideration: CR S12599)
  7. S.Amdt.2939 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: To require the Secretary to provide information regarding enrollee satisfaction with qualified health plans offered through an Exchange through the Internet portal.
    Sponsor: Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] (Submitted 12/05/2009) (Proposed 12/06/2009)
    Cosponsors: 3
    Latest Action: 12/07/09 Amendment SA 2939, under the order of 12/7/2009, having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative, the amendment was agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 98 - 0. Record Vote Number: 367. (consideration: CR S12565)
  8. S.Amdt.2927 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: Relative to limitation on amount of attorney's contingency fees.
    Sponsor: Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV] (Submitted 12/05/2009) (Proposed 12/05/2009)
    Cosponsors: 2
    Latest Action: 12/06/09 Proposed amendment SA 2927 under the order of 12/5/2009, not having achived 60 votes in the affirmative, the amendment was withdrawn in Senate. (consideration: CR S12543)
  9. S.Amdt.2926 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: To protect home health benefits.
    Sponsor: Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] (Submitted 12/05/2009) (Proposed 12/05/2009)
    Cosponsors: 0
    Latest Action: 12/05/09 Amendment SA 2926 under the order of 12/5/2009, having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative, the amendment was agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 96 - 0. Record Vote Number: 363.
  10. S.Amdt.2905 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: To modify the limit on excessive remuneration paid by certain health insurance providers to set the limit at the same levels as the salary of the President of the United States.
    Sponsor: Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] (Submitted 12/04/2009) (Proposed 12/04/2009)
    Cosponsors: 6
    Latest Action: 12/06/09 Proposed amendment SA 2905 under the order of 12/5/2009, not having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative, the amendment was withdrawn in Senate. (consideration: CR S12541)
  11. S.Amdt.2901 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: To eliminate new entitlement programs and limit the government control over the health care of American families.
    Sponsor: Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] (Submitted 12/04/2009) (Proposed 12/04/2009)
    Cosponsors: 0
    Latest Action: 12/04/09 Proposed amendment SA 2901 under the order of 12/4/2009, not having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative, the amendment was withdrawn in Senate. (consideration: CR S12395)
  12. S.Amdt.2899 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: To ensure that there is no reduction or elimination of any benefits guaranteed by law to participants in Medicare Advantage plans.
    Sponsor: Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] (Submitted 12/04/2009) (Proposed 12/04/2009)
    Cosponsors: 0
    Latest Action: 12/04/09 Amendment SA 2899 under the order of 12/4/2009, having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative, the amendment was agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 97 - 1. Record Vote Number: 361.
  13. S.Amdt.2870 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: To promote fiscal responsibility by protecting the Social Security surplus and CLASS program savings in this Act.
    Sponsor: Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] (Submitted 12/03/2009) (Proposed 12/03/2009)
    Cosponsors: 0
    Latest Action: 12/04/09 Amendment SA 2870 under the order of 12/4/2009, having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative, the amendment was agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 98 - 0. Record Vote Number: 359.
  14. S.Amdt.2836 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: To ensure patients receive doctor recommendations for preventive health services, including mammograms and cervical cancer screening, without interference from government or insurance company bureaucrats.
    Sponsor: Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] (Submitted 12/02/2009) (Proposed 12/03/2009)
    Cosponsors: 3
    Latest Action: 12/03/09 Proposed amendment SA 2836 under the order of 12/2/2009, not having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative, the amendment was withdrawn in Senate. (consideration: CR S12277)
  15. S.Amdt.2826 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: To protect and improve guaranteed Medicare benefits.
    Sponsor: Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] (Submitted 12/02/2009) (Proposed 12/03/2009)
    Cosponsors: 9
    Latest Action: 12/03/09 Amendment SA 2826 under the order of 12/2/2009, having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative, the amendment was agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 100 - 0. Record Vote Number: 357.
  16. S.Amdt.2793 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: To provide for the importation of prescription drugs.
    Sponsor: Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] (Submitted 12/01/2009) (Proposed 12/08/2009)
    Cosponsors: 20
    Latest Action: 12/16/09 Proposed amendment SA 2793 under the order of 12/15/2009, not having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative, the amendement was withdrawn in Senate. (consideration: CR S13238)
  17. S.Amdt.2791 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: To clarify provisions relating to first dollar coverage for preventive services for women.
    Sponsor: Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] (Submitted 11/30/2009) (Proposed 11/30/2009)
    Cosponsors: 17
    Latest Action: 12/03/09 Amendment SA 2791 under the order of 12/2/2009, having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative, the amendment was agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 61 - 39. Record Vote Number: 355.
  18. S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: In the nature of a substitute.
    Sponsor: Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] (Submitted 11/19/2009) (Proposed 11/21/2009)
    Cosponsors: 3
    Latest Action: 12/23/09 Amendment SA 2786 agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 60 - 39. Record Vote Number: 394.
    Notes: Printed text [PDF] of Amendment No. 2786.