Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8]* 09/17/2009
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 09/17/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 09/17/2009
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 09/24/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 10/28/2009
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 12/01/2009
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 12/07/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 12/14/2009
Rep. Minnick, Walter [D-ID-1] 12/15/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 01/12/2010
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 01/13/2010
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 02/04/2010
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 02/22/2010
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 03/10/2010
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 04/15/2010
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 12/14/2010