There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the United States International Broadcasting Act of 1994 to extend by one year the operation of Radio Free Asia, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (7)

Date Actions Overview
10/09/2009Became Public Law No: 111-71. (TXT | PDF)
10/09/2009Signed by President.
09/30/2009Presented to President.
09/29/2009Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
09/29/2009Senate Committee on Foreign Relations discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S9941)
09/23/2009Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H9823)
09/17/2009Introduced in House

All Actions (14)

Date Chamber All Actions
10/09/2009Became Public Law No: 111-71. (TXT | PDF)
10/09/2009Signed by President.
09/30/2009HousePresented to President.
09/30/2009SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
09/29/2009SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
09/29/2009SenateSenate Committee on Foreign Relations discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S9941)
09/24/2009SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
09/23/2009-11:25amHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/23/2009-11:25amHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H9823)
09/23/2009-11:14amHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3593.
09/23/2009-11:14amHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H9823-9824)
09/23/2009-11:14amHouseMs. Watson moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
09/17/2009HouseReferred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
09/17/2009HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 09/17/2009

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Foreign Affairs09/17/2009 Referred to
Senate Foreign Relations09/24/2009 Referred to
09/29/2009 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (3)


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for H.R.3593. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 111-71 (10/09/2009)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Amends the United States International Broadcasting Act of 1994 to extend the authority of the Broadcasting Board of Governors to make grants to operate Radio Free Asia through September 30, 2010.