Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21]* 09/21/2009
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 09/21/2009
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43]* 09/21/2009
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 09/21/2009
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45]* 09/21/2009
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2]* 09/21/2009
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 09/21/2009
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 09/21/2009
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 09/21/2009
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 09/21/2009
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-41]* 09/21/2009
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3]* 09/21/2009
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-22]* 09/21/2009
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 09/21/2009
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 09/21/2009
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large]* 09/21/2009
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19]* 09/21/2009
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11]* 09/21/2009
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 09/22/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 09/22/2009
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 09/22/2009
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 09/22/2009
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 09/22/2009
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 09/22/2009
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 09/23/2009
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 09/30/2009
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 10/01/2009
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 10/06/2009
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 10/06/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 10/06/2009
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 10/08/2009
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 10/14/2009
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 10/15/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 10/22/2009
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 10/28/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 10/28/2009
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 10/29/2009
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 11/03/2009
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 11/04/2009
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 12/15/2009
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 03/16/2010