Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 09/22/2009
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9]* 09/22/2009
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 09/22/2009
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 09/24/2009
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 09/30/2009
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 09/30/2009
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 10/01/2009
Rep. Markey, Betsy [D-CO-4] 10/01/2009
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 10/07/2009
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 10/14/2009
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 10/14/2009
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 10/14/2009
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 10/14/2009
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 10/14/2009
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 10/14/2009
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 10/14/2009
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 10/14/2009
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 10/14/2009
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 10/14/2009
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 10/14/2009
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 10/14/2009
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 10/14/2009
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 11/05/2009
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 11/05/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 11/06/2009
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 11/06/2009
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 11/06/2009
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 04/15/2010
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 04/15/2010

Show cosponsors who withdrew