There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Transparency and Executive Accountability Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Ethics in Government Act of 1978 to modify financial disclosure filing requirements for certain employees of the Executive Office of the President.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
09/22/2009Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
10/23/2009Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Workforce, Post Office, and the District of Columbia.
Action By: Committee on Oversight and Government Reform
09/22/2009Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/22/2009Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (57)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 09/23/2009
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 09/23/2009
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 09/23/2009
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 09/23/2009
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 09/23/2009
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 09/23/2009
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 09/23/2009
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 09/23/2009
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 09/23/2009
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 09/23/2009
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 09/23/2009
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52] 09/23/2009
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 09/23/2009
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 09/23/2009
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 09/23/2009
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 09/23/2009
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 09/25/2009
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 09/25/2009
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 09/30/2009
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 09/30/2009
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 10/01/2009
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 10/01/2009
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 10/01/2009
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 10/06/2009
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 10/06/2009
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 10/06/2009
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 10/06/2009
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 10/08/2009
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 10/08/2009
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 10/08/2009
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 10/08/2009
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 10/08/2009
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 10/08/2009
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 10/08/2009
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 10/20/2009
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 10/20/2009
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 10/20/2009
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 10/20/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 10/20/2009
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 10/20/2009
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 10/22/2009
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 10/27/2009
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 10/27/2009
Rep. Cao, Anh "Joseph" [R-LA-2] 10/27/2009
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 10/28/2009
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 10/28/2009
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 10/28/2009
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 11/06/2009
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 11/17/2009
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 11/17/2009
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 11/17/2009
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 11/17/2009
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 11/17/2009
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 11/19/2009
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 11/19/2009
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 12/16/2009
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 01/21/2010

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Oversight and Government Reform09/22/2009 Referred to
House Oversight and Government Reform Subcommittee on Federal Workforce, Post Office, and the District of Columbia10/23/2009 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.3613.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3613. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (09/22/2009)

Transparency and Executive Accountability Act - Amends the Ethics in Government Act of 1978 to require individuals subject to financial disclosure filing requirements by virtue of an appointment to a position in the Executive Office of the President to file required reports with the Director of the Office of Government Ethics (curently, with the ethics official of the individual's employing agency).