Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21]* 09/22/2009
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 09/22/2009
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13]* 09/22/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 09/22/2009
Rep. Bright, Bobby [D-AL-2]* 09/22/2009
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1]* 09/22/2009
Rep. Halvorson, Deborah L. [D-IL-11]* 09/22/2009
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 09/22/2009
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 09/22/2009
Rep. Schauer, Mark H. [D-MI-7]* 09/22/2009
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 09/22/2009
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3]* 09/22/2009
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10]* 09/22/2009
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19]* 09/22/2009
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4]* 09/22/2009
Rep. Kosmas, Suzanne M. [D-FL-24]* 09/22/2009
Rep. Markey, Betsy [D-CO-4]* 09/22/2009
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 09/22/2009
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18]* 09/22/2009
Rep. Minnick, Walter [D-ID-1]* 09/22/2009
Rep. Perriello, Thomas S.P. [D-VA-5]* 09/22/2009
Rep. Nye, Glenn C. [D-VA-2]* 09/22/2009
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 10/15/2009
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 12/08/2009
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 01/20/2010
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 03/04/2010
Rep. Dahlkemper, Kathleen A. [D-PA-3] 04/28/2010
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 04/28/2010
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 05/04/2010
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 05/06/2010
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 05/18/2010
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 05/24/2010