Refine your search

13 results for Actions Overview
Date Actions Overview
10/15/2010 Became Public Law No: 111-281. (TXT | PDF)
10/15/2010 Signed by President.
10/04/2010 Presented to President.
09/30/2010 Resolving differences -- House actions: On motion that the House agree to the Senate amendments to the House amendment to the Senate amendment Agreed to without objection.(text as House agreed to Senate amendments to House amendment to Senate amendment: CR H7383-7384)
09/30/2010 Resolving differences -- House actions: On motion that the House agree to the Senate amendments to the House amendments to the Senate amendment Agreed to without objection.
09/29/2010 Resolving differences -- Senate actions: Senate agreed to the House Amendment to the title by Unanimous Consent.
09/29/2010 Resolving differences -- Senate actions: Senate concurred in House amendment with amendments (SA 4684) by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S7718-7719, S7730-7731)
09/28/2010 Resolving differences -- House actions: House agreed to Senate amendment with amendments pursuant to H. Res. 1665.
05/07/2010 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
10/23/2009 Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 385 - 11 (Roll no. 813).
10/16/2009 Committee on Homeland Security discharged.
10/16/2009 Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Transportation. H. Rept. 111-303, Part I.
09/22/2009 Introduced in House