Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 09/23/2009
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 09/23/2009
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 09/23/2009
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 09/23/2009
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 09/23/2009
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 09/23/2009
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 09/29/2009
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 09/29/2009
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 10/01/2009
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 10/01/2009
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 10/08/2009
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 10/08/2009
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 11/16/2009