Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 10/22/2009
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 11/03/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 11/03/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 11/04/2009
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 11/16/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 03/12/2010