Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 09/23/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 09/25/2009
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 09/29/2009
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 10/15/2009
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 02/26/2010
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 04/21/2010
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 06/30/2010