There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To allow the funding for the interoperable emergency communications grant program established under the Digital Television Transition and Public Safety Act of 2005 to remain available until expended through fiscal year 2012, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
09/23/2009Introduced in House

All Actions (10)

Date All Actions
10/15/2009Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
10/15/2009Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
10/15/2009Ordered to be Reported (Amended).
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
10/15/2009Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
10/08/2009Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote .
Action By: House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Communications, Technology, and the Internet
10/08/2009Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Communications, Technology, and the Internet
09/24/2009Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications, Technology, and the Internet.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
09/23/2009Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/23/2009Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E2344)
Action By: House of Representatives
09/23/2009Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (18)


Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce09/23/2009 Referred to
10/15/2009 Markup by
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Communications, Technology, and the Internet09/24/2009 Referred to
10/08/2009 Markup by
10/08/2009 Reported by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3633. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (09/23/2009)

Requires, notwithstanding specified provisions of the Digital Television Transition and Public Safety Act of 2005, that sums made available to administer the Public Safety Interoperable Communications Grant Program remain available until expended, but not beyond September 30, 2012.

Extends the period for performance of any investment approved under the Program as of enactment of this Act by one year, but not later than September 30, 2011. Allows the Assistant Secretary of Commerce for Communications and Information to extend, on a case-by-case basis, the period of performance for any such investment for a period of not more than 2 years, but not later than September 30, 2012.