Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 09/29/2009
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 10/28/2009
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 11/02/2009
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 11/04/2009
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 11/06/2009
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 11/17/2009
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 11/18/2009
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 11/19/2009
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 12/02/2009
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 12/09/2009
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 12/09/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 12/09/2009
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 12/09/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 12/09/2009
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 12/15/2009
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/30/2010