Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 09/25/2009
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14]* 09/25/2009
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11]* 09/25/2009
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10]* 09/25/2009
Rep. Kratovil, Frank, Jr. [D-MD-1]* 09/25/2009
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 09/29/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 09/29/2009
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 09/29/2009
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 09/29/2009
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 09/29/2009
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 09/30/2009
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 10/06/2009
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 10/06/2009
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 10/06/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 10/07/2009
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 10/08/2009
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 10/08/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 10/22/2009
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 10/22/2009
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 10/27/2009
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 10/27/2009
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 10/27/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 10/27/2009
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 10/27/2009
Rep. Murphy, Scott [D-NY-20] 10/27/2009
Rep. Cao, Anh "Joseph" [R-LA-2] 10/27/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 10/27/2009
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 10/27/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 10/29/2009
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 10/29/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 10/29/2009
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 10/29/2009
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 11/02/2009
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 11/04/2009
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 11/05/2009
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 11/05/2009
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 11/06/2009
Rep. Adler, John H. [D-NJ-3] 12/03/2009
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 03/11/2010