Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 10/21/2009
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 10/21/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 10/21/2009
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 10/21/2009
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 10/27/2009
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 10/28/2009
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 11/02/2009
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 11/16/2009
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 11/16/2009
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 11/18/2009
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 12/01/2009
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 12/15/2009
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 01/12/2010
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 01/12/2010
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 01/12/2010
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 01/12/2010
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 01/12/2010
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 01/12/2010
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 01/12/2010
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 01/19/2010
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 01/20/2010
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 01/26/2010
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 02/02/2010
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 02/22/2010
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 02/22/2010
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 02/22/2010
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8] 02/22/2010
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 03/04/2010
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 03/04/2010
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 03/04/2010
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 03/09/2010
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 03/09/2010
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 03/09/2010
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/09/2010
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 03/09/2010
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 03/09/2010
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 03/09/2010
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 03/16/2010
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 03/16/2010
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10] 03/16/2010
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 03/16/2010
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 03/16/2010
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 03/16/2010
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 03/16/2010
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 03/16/2010
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 03/16/2010
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 04/13/2010
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 04/13/2010
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 04/13/2010
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 04/13/2010
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 04/13/2010
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 04/13/2010
Rep. Nye, Glenn C. [D-VA-2] 04/13/2010
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 04/13/2010
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 04/13/2010
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 04/13/2010
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 04/13/2010
Rep. Kilroy, Mary Jo [D-OH-15] 04/20/2010
Rep. Teague, Harry [D-NM-2] 04/20/2010
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 04/20/2010
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 04/20/2010
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 04/20/2010
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 04/20/2010
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 04/20/2010
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 04/20/2010
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 04/20/2010
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 04/20/2010
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 04/22/2010
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 04/22/2010
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 04/22/2010
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 04/22/2010
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 04/22/2010
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 05/06/2010
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 05/06/2010
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 05/06/2010
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 05/06/2010
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 05/06/2010
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 05/06/2010
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 05/06/2010
Rep. Driehaus, Steve [D-OH-1] 05/11/2010
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 05/11/2010
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 05/11/2010
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 05/20/2010
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 05/20/2010
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 05/20/2010
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 05/20/2010
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5] 05/20/2010
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 05/20/2010
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 05/28/2010
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 05/28/2010
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 05/28/2010
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 05/28/2010
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 05/28/2010
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 05/28/2010
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 06/09/2010
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 06/09/2010
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 06/09/2010
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 06/09/2010
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/09/2010
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 06/09/2010
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 06/17/2010
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 06/17/2010
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 06/22/2010
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 06/22/2010
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 06/22/2010
Rep. Boccieri, John A. [D-OH-16] 07/19/2010
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 07/19/2010
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 07/19/2010
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 07/22/2010
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 07/22/2010
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 07/29/2010
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 07/29/2010
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 07/29/2010
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 07/29/2010
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 07/29/2010
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 07/29/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 09/15/2010
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 09/15/2010
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 09/15/2010
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 09/15/2010
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 09/15/2010
Rep. Kratovil, Frank, Jr. [D-MD-1] 09/15/2010
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 09/28/2010
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 09/28/2010
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 09/28/2010
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 09/28/2010
Rep. Critz, Mark S. [D-PA-12] 09/29/2010
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 11/18/2010
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 11/18/2010
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 11/18/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 12/13/2010
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 12/13/2010
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 12/14/2010
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 12/15/2010