Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3]* 09/25/2009
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 10/15/2009
Rep. Cao, Anh "Joseph" [R-LA-2] 10/20/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 10/27/2009
Rep. Kosmas, Suzanne M. [D-FL-24] 10/29/2009
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 12/02/2009
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 12/02/2009
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 12/08/2009
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8] 12/16/2009