Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 01/21/2010
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 01/21/2010
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 01/21/2010
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 01/21/2010
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 01/21/2010
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/09/2010
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 03/11/2010
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 03/17/2010
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 03/24/2010
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 04/13/2010
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 04/15/2010
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 05/06/2010
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 07/26/2010
Rep. Adler, John H. [D-NJ-3] 09/15/2010
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 11/15/2010