Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 09/29/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 09/29/2009
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 09/29/2009
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 09/29/2009
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 12/14/2009
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 01/21/2010
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 04/20/2010
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 04/28/2010