Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8]* 09/29/2009
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 10/08/2009
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 10/08/2009
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 10/15/2009
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 10/15/2009
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 10/29/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 10/29/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 11/19/2009
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 12/01/2009
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 12/16/2009
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 03/03/2010
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 03/03/2010
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 04/22/2010
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 04/29/2010
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 04/29/2010
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 05/06/2010
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 05/06/2010
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 05/11/2010
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 05/20/2010
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 05/27/2010
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 08/10/2010
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 09/15/2010
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 09/16/2010
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 09/16/2010
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 09/22/2010
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 09/22/2010
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 09/22/2010
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 09/22/2010
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 09/22/2010
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 09/28/2010
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 09/28/2010
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 09/28/2010
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 09/28/2010
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 09/28/2010
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 09/28/2010