Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3]* 09/29/2009
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 09/29/2009
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 09/29/2009
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 09/29/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 09/29/2009
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 09/29/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 09/29/2009
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 09/29/2009
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4]* 09/29/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 09/29/2009
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 09/29/2009
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10]* 09/29/2009
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 09/29/2009
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 09/29/2009
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1]* 09/29/2009
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 09/29/2009
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17]* 09/29/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 09/29/2009
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 09/29/2009
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 09/29/2009
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 09/29/2009
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 09/29/2009
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 09/29/2009
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27]* 09/29/2009
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 10/06/2009
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 10/06/2009
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 10/06/2009
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 10/06/2009
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 10/14/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 10/14/2009
Rep. Schauer, Mark H. [D-MI-7] 10/14/2009
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 10/21/2009
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 10/28/2009
Rep. Dahlkemper, Kathleen A. [D-PA-3] 11/19/2009
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 01/13/2010
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 01/13/2010
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 02/22/2010
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 03/12/2010
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 03/15/2010
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/15/2010