Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 09/30/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 09/30/2009
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 09/30/2009
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 09/30/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 09/30/2009
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7]* 09/30/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 09/30/2009
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 10/06/2009
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 10/08/2009
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 10/14/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 10/26/2009
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 10/28/2009
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8] 11/16/2009