Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 09/30/2009
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 10/20/2009
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 10/20/2009
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 10/20/2009
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 11/04/2009
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 11/16/2009
Rep. Djou, Charles K. [R-HI-1] 06/16/2010