There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To require the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to include on the main page of the Internet website of the Department of Veterans Affairs a hyperlink to the VetSuccess Internet website and to publicize such Internet website.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
09/29/2010Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 425 - 0 (Roll no. 551).(text: CR 9/28/2010 H7017)
09/28/2010Reported by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 111-624.
09/30/2009Introduced in House

All Actions (18)

Date Chamber
09/29/2010SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
09/29/2010-3:45pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 425 - 0 (Roll no. 551). (text: CR 9/28/2010 H7017)
09/29/2010-3:45pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/29/2010-3:37pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H7257-7258)
09/28/2010-1:15pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
09/28/2010-1:07pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3685.
09/28/2010-1:07pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7017-7019)
09/28/2010-1:07pmHouseMr. Filner moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
09/28/2010HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 364.
09/28/2010HouseReported by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 111-624.
09/15/2010HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
09/15/2010HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
07/15/2010HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by the Yeas and Nays: 4 - 1 .
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity
07/15/2010HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity
06/10/2010HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity
10/02/2009HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
09/30/2009HouseReferred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
09/30/2009HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (0)

No cosponsors.


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs09/30/2009 Referred to
09/15/2010 Markup by
09/28/2010 Reported by H. Rept. 111-624
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity10/02/2009 Referred to
06/10/2010 Hearings by
07/15/2010 Markup by
07/15/2010 Reported by
Senate Veterans' Affairs09/29/2010 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.3685.


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.3685. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House without amendment (09/29/2010)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Directs the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to include on the main page of the Internet website of the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) a hyperlink with a drop-down menu titled "Veterans Employment" that includes a direct hyperlink to the VetSuccess Internet website, USA Jobs Internet website, Job Central website, and any other appropriate employment Internet websites, especially those that focus on jobs for veterans.

Requires the purchase of advertising in national media outlets to promote awareness of the VetSuccess Internet website to veterans.

Provides for outreach to veterans of Operation Iraqi Freedom and Operation Enduring Freedom to inform them of the VetSuccess Internet website.