Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4]* 10/01/2009
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large]* 10/01/2009
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 10/01/2009
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2]* 10/01/2009
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9]* 10/01/2009
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 10/22/2009
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 10/27/2009
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 10/27/2009
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 10/27/2009
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 11/07/2009
Rep. Kratovil, Frank, Jr. [D-MD-1] 11/07/2009
Rep. Murphy, Scott [D-NY-20] 12/01/2009
Rep. Dahlkemper, Kathleen A. [D-PA-3] 12/11/2009
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 01/19/2010