Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 10/08/2009
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 12/03/2009
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 12/03/2009
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 12/03/2009
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 03/03/2010
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 07/19/2010
Rep. Griffith, Parker [R-AL-5] 07/20/2010
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 07/21/2010
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 07/29/2010
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 09/14/2010
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 09/29/2010
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 11/17/2010