Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 10/01/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 10/01/2009
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 10/01/2009
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 10/01/2009
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 10/01/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 10/01/2009
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 10/01/2009
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 10/01/2009
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 10/01/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 10/01/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 10/01/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 10/01/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 10/01/2009
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 10/01/2009
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 10/01/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 10/01/2009
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 10/01/2009
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4]* 10/01/2009
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11]* 10/01/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 10/01/2009
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8]* 10/01/2009
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 10/08/2009
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 10/21/2009
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 12/03/2009
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 12/09/2009
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 12/09/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 12/11/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 01/27/2010
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 02/22/2010
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 04/29/2010
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 05/11/2010
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/20/2010
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 07/29/2010