Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 02/23/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 02/24/2009
Rep. Cao, Anh "Joseph" [R-LA-2] 02/24/2009
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 03/03/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 03/12/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 09/08/2009