Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 10/01/2009
Rep. McMahon, Michael E. [D-NY-13]* 10/01/2009
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3]* 10/01/2009
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 10/07/2009
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 10/08/2009
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 10/08/2009
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 10/08/2009
Rep. Lee, Christopher J. [R-NY-26] 10/21/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 10/21/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 10/21/2009
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 11/04/2009
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 11/19/2009