Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24]* 10/01/2009
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48]* 10/01/2009
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 10/01/2009
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 10/01/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 10/01/2009
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 10/01/2009
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12]* 10/01/2009
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 10/01/2009
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9]* 10/01/2009
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 10/01/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 10/01/2009
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1]* 10/01/2009
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 10/01/2009
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 10/01/2009
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13]* 10/01/2009
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 10/01/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7]* 10/01/2009
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 10/01/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 10/06/2009
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 10/06/2009
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 10/06/2009
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 10/07/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 10/07/2009
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 10/07/2009
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 10/14/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 10/14/2009
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 10/14/2009
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 10/14/2009
Rep. Cao, Anh "Joseph" [R-LA-2] 10/14/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 10/14/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 10/14/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 10/14/2009
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 10/15/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 10/15/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 10/15/2009
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 10/15/2009
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 10/20/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 10/20/2009
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 10/20/2009
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 10/21/2009
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 10/21/2009
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 10/21/2009
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4] 10/22/2009
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 10/27/2009
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 10/27/2009
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 10/27/2009
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 10/27/2009
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 10/27/2009
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 12/02/2009
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 12/02/2009
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 12/09/2009
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 12/09/2009
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 12/11/2009
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 12/11/2009
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 12/11/2009
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 12/11/2009
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 12/11/2009
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 12/16/2009
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 01/26/2010
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 01/26/2010
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 01/26/2010
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 01/26/2010
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 01/26/2010
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 01/27/2010
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 02/02/2010
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 02/02/2010
Rep. Dahlkemper, Kathleen A. [D-PA-3] 02/02/2010
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 02/02/2010
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 02/02/2010
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 02/02/2010
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 02/02/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 02/04/2010
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 02/04/2010
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 02/23/2010
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 02/23/2010
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 02/23/2010
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 02/23/2010
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 02/23/2010
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 02/23/2010
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 02/23/2010
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 02/23/2010
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 03/03/2010
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 03/03/2010
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 03/03/2010
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 03/03/2010
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 03/03/2010
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 03/03/2010
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 03/15/2010
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 03/15/2010
Rep. Minnick, Walter [D-ID-1] 03/15/2010
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 03/15/2010
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 03/15/2010
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 04/15/2010
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10] 04/15/2010
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 04/15/2010
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 04/15/2010
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 04/15/2010
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 04/15/2010
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 04/28/2010
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 04/28/2010
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8] 05/13/2010
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 06/08/2010
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 06/08/2010
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/08/2010
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 06/08/2010
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 06/08/2010
Rep. Critz, Mark S. [D-PA-12] 06/08/2010
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 06/08/2010
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 06/22/2010
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/22/2010
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 06/22/2010
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 06/22/2010
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 07/01/2010
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 07/01/2010
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 07/15/2010