Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 10/01/2009
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3]* 10/01/2009
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 10/01/2009
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 10/01/2009
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 10/01/2009
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 10/01/2009
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27]* 10/01/2009
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 10/01/2009
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 10/01/2009
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 10/01/2009
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3]* 10/01/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 10/01/2009
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 10/01/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 10/01/2009
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 10/01/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 10/01/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 10/01/2009
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 10/01/2009
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3]* 10/01/2009
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4]* 10/01/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 10/01/2009
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 10/01/2009
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21]* 10/01/2009
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24]* 10/01/2009
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 10/01/2009
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 10/01/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13]* 10/01/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 10/01/2009
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2]* 10/01/2009
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 10/01/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 10/01/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 10/01/2009
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 10/01/2009
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 10/01/2009
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 10/01/2009
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5]* 10/01/2009
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 10/01/2009
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 10/01/2009
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 10/01/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7]* 10/01/2009
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 10/07/2009
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 10/07/2009
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 10/07/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 10/07/2009
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7] 10/15/2009
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 10/21/2009
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 10/21/2009
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 10/21/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 10/22/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 10/23/2009
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 10/28/2009
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 11/03/2009
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 11/06/2009
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 11/16/2009
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 12/03/2009
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 12/07/2009
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 12/11/2009
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 01/12/2010
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 01/13/2010
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 01/13/2010
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 01/27/2010
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 02/02/2010
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 02/02/2010
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 02/04/2010
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 02/04/2010
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 03/03/2010
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 03/04/2010
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 03/09/2010
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 03/16/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 03/19/2010
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 04/13/2010
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 04/13/2010
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-25] 04/14/2010
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 05/20/2010