Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18]* 10/06/2009
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1]* 10/06/2009
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 10/06/2009
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 10/09/2009
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 11/19/2009
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 12/08/2009
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 12/15/2009
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 03/03/2010
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 03/24/2010
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 04/13/2010
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 04/13/2010
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 04/13/2010
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 04/14/2010
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 06/23/2010
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 07/14/2010
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 07/30/2010