Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 10/06/2009
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 10/06/2009
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 10/06/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 10/06/2009
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32]* 10/06/2009
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11]* 10/06/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 10/06/2009
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17]* 10/06/2009
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 10/06/2009
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 10/06/2009
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large]* 10/06/2009
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 10/06/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 10/06/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 10/06/2009
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 10/06/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7]* 10/06/2009
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 10/08/2009
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 10/08/2009
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 10/14/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 10/21/2009
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 10/21/2009
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 10/22/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 10/26/2009
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 11/02/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 12/01/2009
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 12/01/2009
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 12/09/2009
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 01/19/2010
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 01/21/2010
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 01/26/2010
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 02/03/2010
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 03/02/2010
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/11/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/11/2010
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 05/24/2010
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 05/28/2010
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 06/16/2010
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 06/22/2010
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 06/23/2010
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 06/24/2010
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 06/29/2010
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/30/2010
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 09/14/2010
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 09/20/2010
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 09/22/2010