Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 10/07/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 10/14/2009
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 10/14/2009
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 10/20/2009
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 10/20/2009
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 10/20/2009
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 10/20/2009
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 10/20/2009
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 10/20/2009
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 10/20/2009
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 10/20/2009
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 10/21/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 11/03/2009
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8] 11/16/2009