Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Halvorson, Deborah L. [D-IL-11] 03/23/2010
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 05/19/2010
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 06/22/2010
Rep. Dahlkemper, Kathleen A. [D-PA-3] 06/22/2010
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 06/22/2010
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 06/23/2010
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 06/24/2010
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/24/2010
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 06/24/2010
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/24/2010
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 06/28/2010
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 06/28/2010
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 06/29/2010
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 06/29/2010
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 06/30/2010
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 06/30/2010
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 06/30/2010
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 07/01/2010
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 07/01/2010
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 07/01/2010
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 07/01/2010
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 07/13/2010
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 07/13/2010
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 07/13/2010
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 07/13/2010
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 07/14/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 07/15/2010
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 07/20/2010
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 07/20/2010
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 07/20/2010
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8] 07/20/2010
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 07/20/2010
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 07/20/2010
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 07/22/2010
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/27/2010
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 07/27/2010
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 07/27/2010
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 07/29/2010
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 08/10/2010
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 09/15/2010