Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 10/06/2009
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 10/06/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 10/06/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 10/06/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 10/06/2009
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 10/06/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 10/06/2009
Rep. McMahon, Michael E. [D-NY-13]* 10/06/2009
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 10/06/2009
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 10/06/2009
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 10/06/2009
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5]* 10/06/2009
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 10/06/2009
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 10/06/2009
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7]* 10/06/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 10/06/2009
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23]* 10/06/2009
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 10/06/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 10/06/2009
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 10/06/2009
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 10/06/2009
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 10/06/2009
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 10/07/2009
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 10/07/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 10/20/2009
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 10/21/2009
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 10/21/2009
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 10/21/2009
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 10/21/2009
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 10/21/2009
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 10/21/2009
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 10/21/2009
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 10/21/2009
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 10/21/2009
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 10/21/2009
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 10/21/2009
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 10/21/2009
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 10/21/2009
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 10/21/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 10/21/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 10/21/2009
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-25] 10/21/2009
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 10/21/2009
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8] 10/21/2009
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 10/21/2009
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 10/21/2009
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 10/21/2009
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 10/21/2009
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 10/21/2009
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 10/21/2009
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 10/21/2009
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 10/21/2009
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 10/21/2009
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 10/21/2009
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 10/22/2009
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 10/22/2009
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 10/22/2009
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 10/22/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 10/22/2009
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 10/22/2009
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 10/22/2009
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 10/22/2009
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 10/22/2009
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 10/22/2009
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 10/22/2009
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 10/22/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 10/22/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 10/22/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 10/22/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 10/22/2009
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 10/22/2009
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 10/22/2009
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 10/22/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 10/23/2009
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 10/26/2009
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 10/26/2009
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 10/26/2009
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 10/27/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 10/27/2009
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 10/28/2009
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 10/28/2009
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 10/28/2009
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 10/28/2009
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 11/02/2009
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 11/02/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 11/18/2009
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 11/18/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 12/01/2009
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 12/01/2009
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 12/03/2009
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 12/03/2009
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 12/10/2009
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 12/15/2009
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 01/12/2010
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 01/12/2010
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 01/20/2010
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 01/20/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 01/20/2010
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 01/20/2010
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 01/20/2010
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 01/21/2010
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 01/21/2010
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 01/21/2010
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 01/26/2010
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 02/02/2010
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 02/02/2010
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 02/03/2010
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 02/22/2010
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 03/09/2010
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 03/09/2010
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 03/10/2010
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 03/12/2010
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 03/15/2010
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 04/13/2010
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 04/21/2010
Rep. Driehaus, Steve [D-OH-1] 04/21/2010
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 04/27/2010
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 04/27/2010
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 04/29/2010
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 05/05/2010
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 05/11/2010
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 05/11/2010
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 05/13/2010
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 05/18/2010
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 05/27/2010
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 06/08/2010
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 06/16/2010
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 06/30/2010
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 07/01/2010
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 07/01/2010
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 07/27/2010
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 11/29/2010