Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 10/08/2009
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 10/08/2009
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 10/08/2009
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 10/08/2009
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 10/08/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 10/08/2009
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 10/08/2009
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 10/08/2009
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 10/08/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 10/08/2009
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 10/14/2009
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 10/14/2009
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 10/14/2009
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 10/14/2009
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 10/14/2009
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 10/14/2009
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 10/14/2009
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 10/29/2009
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 10/29/2009
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 10/29/2009
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 10/29/2009
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 11/03/2009
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 11/03/2009
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 11/03/2009
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 01/13/2010
Rep. Schauer, Mark H. [D-MI-7] 01/13/2010
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 01/13/2010
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 01/13/2010
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 02/22/2010
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 03/04/2010
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 03/04/2010
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 07/13/2010
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 07/13/2010
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 07/15/2010
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 07/20/2010
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 07/20/2010
Rep. Griffith, Parker [R-AL-5] 07/20/2010
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 07/20/2010
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 07/20/2010
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 07/28/2010
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 07/28/2010
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/30/2010
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/23/2010
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 11/16/2010