Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1]* 10/07/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 10/07/2009
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 10/07/2009
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 10/07/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 10/07/2009
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6]* 10/07/2009
Rep. Dahlkemper, Kathleen A. [D-PA-3]* 10/07/2009
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8]* 10/07/2009
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 10/07/2009
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8]* 10/07/2009
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 10/07/2009
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 10/07/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 10/07/2009
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 10/07/2009
Rep. Perriello, Thomas S.P. [D-VA-5]* 10/07/2009
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23]* 10/07/2009
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3]* 10/07/2009
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 10/07/2009
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11]* 10/07/2009
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 10/07/2009
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9]* 10/07/2009
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 10/07/2009
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15]* 10/07/2009
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 10/07/2009
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5]* 10/07/2009
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 10/08/2009
Rep. Boccieri, John A. [D-OH-16] 10/08/2009
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 10/08/2009
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 10/08/2009
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 10/08/2009
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 10/08/2009
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 10/08/2009
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 10/08/2009
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 10/08/2009
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 10/08/2009
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 10/14/2009
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 10/14/2009
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 10/14/2009
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 10/14/2009
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 10/14/2009
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 10/14/2009
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 10/20/2009
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 10/20/2009
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 10/20/2009
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 10/21/2009
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 10/22/2009
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 10/22/2009
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 11/16/2009
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 11/16/2009
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 11/18/2009
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 12/03/2009
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 01/13/2010
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 01/26/2010
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 02/03/2010
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 03/25/2010
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 05/05/2010
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 05/18/2010
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 05/18/2010
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 05/18/2010
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 05/19/2010
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 05/24/2010
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 07/20/2010
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 07/26/2010