Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 10/22/2009
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 10/29/2009
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 10/29/2009
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 11/02/2009
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 11/03/2009
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 11/04/2009
Rep. Lee, Christopher J. [R-NY-26] 12/16/2009
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 01/13/2010
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 01/26/2010
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 03/16/2010
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 03/16/2010
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 04/21/2010
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 04/21/2010
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 05/24/2010
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 06/17/2010
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 07/27/2010
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2] 07/29/2010
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 08/10/2010
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 09/15/2010