Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 10/07/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 10/07/2009
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 10/07/2009
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11]* 10/07/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 10/26/2009
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/22/2010
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 06/30/2010
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 09/28/2010
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 11/15/2010