Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 12/01/2009
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 12/08/2009
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 01/20/2010
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 02/26/2010
Rep. Perriello, Thomas S.P. [D-VA-5] 03/10/2010
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 04/13/2010