Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 10/08/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 10/08/2009
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12]* 10/08/2009
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10]* 10/08/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 10/08/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 10/08/2009
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 11/02/2009
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 11/02/2009
Rep. Nye, Glenn C. [D-VA-2] 12/03/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 12/03/2009
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 12/03/2009
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 12/10/2009
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 12/10/2009
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 01/12/2010
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 01/12/2010
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 01/12/2010
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 01/13/2010
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 01/20/2010
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 01/21/2010
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 02/02/2010
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 02/02/2010
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 02/02/2010
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-25] 02/03/2010
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 02/23/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 02/23/2010
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 02/23/2010
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 02/23/2010
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 02/23/2010
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 03/02/2010
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 03/02/2010
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 03/02/2010
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 03/10/2010
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 03/22/2010
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 04/21/2010
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 04/21/2010
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 04/22/2010
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 04/22/2010
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 04/22/2010
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 04/22/2010
Rep. Driehaus, Steve [D-OH-1] 04/26/2010
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/26/2010
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 04/26/2010
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 04/27/2010
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 04/27/2010
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 04/27/2010
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 04/28/2010
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8] 05/11/2010
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 05/18/2010
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 05/25/2010
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 06/09/2010
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 06/17/2010
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 06/23/2010
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 06/23/2010
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 07/01/2010
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 07/15/2010
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 09/16/2010