Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 10/08/2009
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11]* 10/08/2009
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 10/08/2009
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18]* 10/08/2009
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 10/08/2009
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 10/08/2009
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 10/20/2009
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 10/20/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 11/06/2009
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 11/06/2009
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 11/16/2009
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 11/16/2009
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 02/23/2010