Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 10/08/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13]* 10/08/2009
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 10/08/2009
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 10/08/2009
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 10/08/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 10/08/2009
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 10/08/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 10/08/2009
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 10/08/2009
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 10/08/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 10/14/2009
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 10/20/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 10/20/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 04/15/2010
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/29/2010